This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:50:02 (UTC).

Michael Neal vs Michael Hazarian

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Michael Neal filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Michael Hazarian. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5876

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neal, Michael

Defendant

Hazarian, Michael Andrew

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bohn, Robert Herbert, Jr.

Defendant Attorney

Kramer, Shelley Ann

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion; Comment: *continued from 01/15/19*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Referral: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: TO COMPLAINT : ATTY KRAMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less