This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/29/2023 at 01:38:38 (UTC).

Michael Martinez vs Gabriella Teruel

Case Summary

On 10/17/2022 Michael Martinez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Gabriella Teruel. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3495

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Michael Martinez

Respondent

Gabriella Teruel

Minors

Brayden Martinez

Gavin Martinez

Other

OFFICE OF PRETRIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Marilyn Edith Moreno

Respondent Attorney

Ignascio G. Camarena

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2023
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Domestic Violence; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Settlement Officer Conf; Department: Settlement Officer Conf; Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: OSC: Contempt; Department: Department 76; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: OSC: Contempt; Department: Department 76; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Attorney Fees; Department: Department 76; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: DVRO-CLETS; Filed By: Michael Martinez ,; Comment: AMENDED Proof of Service: DVRO-CLETS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Michael Martinez ,; Comment: Declaration Re: UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution w/minor; Filed By: Michael Martinez ,; Comment: Petition: Dissolution w/minor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Michael Martinez ,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Subsequent Request: DVRO w/ Minor; Filed By: Michael Martinez , Gabriella Teruel ,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: DVRO-CLETS; Filed By: Michael Martinez ,; Comment: Proof of Service: DVRO-CLETS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less