This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 10/08/2019 at 03:11:13 (UTC).

Michael Mann vs Markus Flierl et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Michael Mann filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Markus Flierl. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6101

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Mann Excavation & Demolition

Mann, Michael

Suretec Indemnity Company

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Flierl, Susan

Flierl, Markus

American Contractors Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Rice, Mark John

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

McCarthy, Joseph W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Mann, Michael; Flierl, Markus; Flierl, Susan; Suretec Indemnity Company; American Contractors Indemnity Company; Comment: entire with prejudice by attys Rice and McCarthy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire with prejudice by attys Rice and McCarthy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: Notice: Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Complaint: Amendment To (New Party) - Comment: Doe 1: American Contractors Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: ENV#2314221 / Proposed Order Re: Doe Amendment: No proposed order is required for Doe Amendments to Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: as to the X-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Suretec Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Cross-Complaint - Comment: Atty McCarthy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint; Atty McCarthy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Susan Flierl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Markus Flieril

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Notice: Pendency of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less