This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:48:38 (UTC).

Melissa Domler vs Michael Domler

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Melissa Domler filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Michael Domler. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Rudy, Christopher G and McCracken, JoAnne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1273

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Rudy, Christopher G

McCracken, JoAnne

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Domler, Melissa Raye

Respondent

Domler, Michael Carl

Minor

Domler, Hunter Emmett

Not Classified By Court

County of Santa Clara

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • Request for Order: Mod Custody/Visitation - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: (P) mod c/c, c/v other: move away- tf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Request for Order (Mod. incl Custody and/or Visitation) - Comment: (P) mod c/c, c/v other: move away

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Group Status Conference Calendar - Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Set for Default - LM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Judicial Custody Conf - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: set for YCST 1st referral, Team #7 set from 1/18/19 hrg *RB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Stipulation & Order - No Fee - Comment: P-from 2/20/19 hrg-mag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Judicial Custody Conf - Judicial Officer: Rudy, Christopher G; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: (ptr) by agreement-lci

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Findings & Order After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Request for Order: Other (Fee Applies) - Comment: (p) c/c, c/v, c/s, s/s & s/p- jv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (p) sep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (p) Comm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less