This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:29:49 (UTC).

Melanie Barry Properties, L.P et al vs Design Within Reach, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Melanie Barry Properties, L P filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Design Within Reach, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1840

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Melanie Barry Properties, L.P

Flegel, Nicolas A., Esq.

Defendants

DS Jordan Construction, Inc

Design Within Reach, Inc

McLeod, Scott, Esq.

Freni, John J., Esq.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Siegel, Dan Kahn

Flegel, Nicolas Arthur

Defendant Attorney

Rowe, Jill Battilega

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Melanie Barry Properties, L.P; Design Within Reach, Inc; DS Jordan Construction, Inc; Flegel, Nicolas A., Esq.; McLeod, Scott, Esq.; Freni, John J., Esq.; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: *continued from 05/01/18*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: HRG 07/31/18 - Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Notice - Comment: Notice of Continued Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint; Atty Rowe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Answer- incorrect fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: Def. Design With Reach, Inc.'s deposit of jury fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: First Amended; Atty Siegel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less