This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/21/2022 at 20:35:25 (UTC).

McPharlin Sprinkles & Thomas LLP vs Vasili Stratton et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 McPharlin Sprinkles Thomas LLP filed an Other lawsuit against Vasili Stratton. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1434

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

McPharlin Sprinkles & Thomas LLP

Defendants

Vasili Stratton

Katherine Stratton

Thalia Stratton

Samos Enterprises, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Joseph Mash

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Constantino

Marc L. Shea

Jason Marshall Skaggs

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

2/16/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Stipulation and Order

2/16/2022 Stipulation and Order

Notice

1/31/2022 Notice

Clerk Rejection Letter

1/7/2022 Clerk Rejection Letter

Motion: Consolidate

1/6/2022 Motion: Consolidate

Answer/Response (No Fee)

12/28/2021 Answer/Response (No Fee)

OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

3/1/2022 OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

3/1/2022 OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

3/1/2022 OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/1/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/1/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service

7/7/2021 Proof of Service

Declaration

7/7/2021 Declaration

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

7/19/2021 Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Demurrer

7/19/2021 Demurrer

Declaration: In Support

7/19/2021 Declaration: In Support

Statement: Case Management Conference

7/30/2021 Statement: Case Management Conference

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: McPharlin Sprinkles & Thomas LLP,; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (Thalia Stratton)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: McPharlin Sprinkles & Thomas LLP,; Comment: [WFP JUD01CAL 021622] Stipulation and Order to Release Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Katherine Stratton,; Comment: Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Consolidate Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Katherine Stratton,; Comment: Case name is incorrect.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion: Consolidate; Filed By: Katherine Stratton,; Comment: Filed in 19cv349730- by Atty. Skaggs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer/Response (No Fee); Filed By: Katherine Stratton,; Comment: Answer to Complaint of MCPHARLIN et.al.; Atty: Skaggs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: Katherine Stratton,; Comment: Proof of Electronic Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Filed By: McPharlin Sprinkles & Thomas LLP,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Katherine Stratton,; Comment: ENV#7840544 / Notice: Case number listed should match the case number the document is being filed into even if this is just a notice for consolidation.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: McPharlin Sprinkles & Thomas LLP,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Katherine Stratton,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Demurrer; Filed By: Katherine Stratton,; Comment: Hrg 10-26-21 D2 to the Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum: Points and Authorities; Filed By: Katherine Stratton,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Katherine Stratton, Katherine Stratton,; Comment: Declaration of Demurring

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Katherine Stratton, Katherine Stratton,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: McPharlin Sprinkles & Thomas LLP,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: McPharlin Sprinkles & Thomas LLP,; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: McPharlin Sprinkles & Thomas LLP,; Comment: Complaint for Interpleader

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SKAGGS, JASON M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shea, Marc L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONSTANTINO ESQ, MATTHEW S