Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 02:51:38 (UTC).

MAVB Investments, Inc vs PACIFIC BLUE FINANCIAL

Case Summary

On 06/10/2016 MAVB Investments, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PACIFIC BLUE FINANCIAL. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Steingart, Lisa, Ferrito, Thomas and Ellis, Terry. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5074

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Steingart, Lisa

Ferrito, Thomas

Ellis, Terry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tires Unlimited

MAVB Investments, Inc

Defendant

PACIFIC BLUE FINANCIAL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Dismissal - other (SC); Party: Names: MAVB Investments, Inc; PACIFIC BLUE FINANCIAL; Comment: Dismissed Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • Bulk Scanned Documents - Comment: 06-10-16 to 05-24-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Ellis, Terry; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Stipulation - Comment: Stipulation: Court Appointed Temporary Judge.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Ferrito, Thomas; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Small Claims Subpoena for personal appearance and production of Documents and things at trial or hearing and declaration.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less