This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/23/2022 at 03:12:53 (UTC).

MATTHEW LLAVORE vs BRANDON NGUYEN et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 MATTHEW LLAVORE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRANDON NGUYEN. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0654

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATTHEW LLAVORE

Defendants

BRANDON NGUYEN

CONNIE NGUYEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Stuart Zuckerman

Defendant Attorney

Steven Craig Toschi

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/3/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/3/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

11/3/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

12/8/2021 Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/13/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/13/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Demand: Jury Trial

1/6/2022 Demand: Jury Trial

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/6/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 7; Time: 2:15PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: BRANDON NGUYEN, CONNIE NGUYEN,; Comment: Answer to Complaint, by Atty. Toschi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Demand: Jury Trial; Filed By: BRANDON NGUYEN, CONNIE NGUYEN,; Comment: Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: BRANDON NGUYEN, CONNIE NGUYEN,; Comment: $150.00 pd. by the defendants thru Atty. Toschi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: MATTHEW LLAVORE,; Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MATTHEW LLAVORE,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: MATTHEW LLAVORE,; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOSCHI STEVEN CRAIG