Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/11/2021 at 12:03:27 (UTC).

Masuda v. Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford, et al.

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Masuda filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Walsh, Brian C and Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2980

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Walsh, Brian C

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Masuda, Emily

Defendants

LUCILE SALTER PACKARD CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL AT STANFORD

STANFORD HEALTH CARE

STANFORD HEALTH CARE ADVANTAGE

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Setareh, Shaun

Defendant Attorneys

Chetty, Vijayta R

Cabrera, Alyson Sophia

Bruno, Michael David

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Notice

Notice Removal to Federal Court: Comment: Notice to state court and adverse party of notice of removal to federal court

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

Notice: Entry of Order

Notice: Entry of Order: Comment: Plaintiff's Notice of Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 3/11/21 at 2:30pm by CourtCall; assigned to Hon. Brian C. Walsh for all purposes

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons: Issued/Filed:

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet: Comment: Proposed Class Action; COMPLEX

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: (1st CMC) Proposed Wage and Hour Class Action. Discovery and responsive pleading deadline stayed, as of 12/7/20, when the case was deemed complex. Removed to Federal Court on 12/29/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice Removal to Federal Court: Comment: Notice to state court and adverse party of notice of removal to federal court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Entry of Order - Notice: Entry of Order: Comment: Plaintiff's Notice of Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: Deeming Case Complex - Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Lawsuit Notice - Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 3/11/21 at 2:30pm by CourtCall; assigned to Hon. Brian C. Walsh for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Summons: Issued/Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet: Comment: Proposed Class Action; COMPLEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lucile Salter Packard Children's Hospital at Stanford is a litigant

Latest cases where STANFORD HEALTH CARE A NONPROFIT CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant