This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/02/2022 at 21:29:35 (UTC).

Massoud Dabir and Bita M. Dabir

Case Summary

On 04/18/2014 Massoud Dabir and Bita M Dabir was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2354

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Massoud Dabir

Respondent

Bita Mirafshar Dabir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Benita A Ventresca

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2015
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Status; Department: Department 82; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Not Heard: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice; Filed By: Massoud Dabir,; Comment: Legacy Name = Req:Dismissal,Entire W/Prej Decision = G Closed = 05/19/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Status; Department: Department 82; Time: 9:30AM; Result: Continued: Current Month

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Status; Department: Department 82; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Continued: Future Month

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • DocketDescription: Order: Change STC or CRC date; Filed By: Massoud Dabir,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Req&Ord:Change STC or CRC Date Decision = G Closed = 01/27/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Status; Department: Department 82; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Continued: Future Month

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • DocketDescription: Order: Change STC or CRC date; Filed By: Massoud Dabir,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Req&Ord:Change STC or CRC Date Decision = M Closed = 05/22/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Massoud Dabir,; Comment: Text = petition, summons... Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 05/13/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution no minor; Filed By: Massoud Dabir,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage/No minor Decision = M Closed = 04/18/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Massoud Dabir,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 04/18/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Residence; Filed By: Massoud Dabir,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 04/18/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ventresca, Benita A