This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/24/2019 at 03:18:41 (UTC).

Massage Therapy Center vs A. Olian

Case Summary

On 03/20/2013 Massage Therapy Center filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against A Olian. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Madden, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************9403

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Massage Therapy Center

368 California Ave

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Defendants

Addison Olian

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Olian, Addison

Addison Olian Inc.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2013
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Olian, Addison; Party: Name: Massage Therapy Center

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Olian, Addison; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Massage Therapy Center; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Olian, Addison; Awarded Against: Massage Therapy Center; Comment: printdate=Jul 16 2013; freetext=Defendant does not owe plaintiff any money on plaintiff's claim Plaintiff does not owe defendant any money on defendant's claim; possessionflag=0; printpartiesflag=1; origjudgdate=Jul 15 2013; judgstatusdate=Jul 16 2013; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Olian, Addison; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Massage Therapy Center; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 07/15/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • Answer: Request for Court Order (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Answer:Request for Court Order Decision = M Closed = 07/08/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • Request: Court Order (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Court Order & Answer Decision = M Closed = 07/02/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • Defendant's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Defendant Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 07/02/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Date = 04/22/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = request for continuance granted Legacy Name = SC Order of Court Decision = M Closed = 04/22/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Continuance/After Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 03/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 04/23/2013

    Read MoreRead Less