This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 07/31/2020 at 12:21:34 (UTC).

Mary Berger vs Janitorial Equipment Services

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 Mary Berger filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Janitorial Equipment Services. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4680

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Berger, Mary

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Safeway, Inc.

Janitorial Equipment Services

King Janitorial Equipment Services

Janitorial Equipment Services, Inc,

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

King Janitorial Equipment Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jachimowicz, Joshua R.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Moore, Katherine R.

Childs, Mary

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: *C/F 7/07/20 per Court*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketAdvance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons on Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint - Comment: Atty: Childs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: To complaint; Atty: Childs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint - Comment: of Safeway, Inc. Atty Moore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint. Atty Moore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: to Cross-Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where King Janitorial Equipment Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Janitorial Equipment Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeway Inc, a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHILDS, MARY