This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:47:26 (UTC).

Mark Augustine vs Milpitas Sanitation

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Mark Augustine filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Milpitas Sanitation. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvarenga, Dania. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3544

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Alvarenga, Dania

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Augustine, Mark J

Defendant

Milpitas Sanitation

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Alvarenga, Dania; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Augustine, Mark J; Awarded Against: Milpitas Sanitation; Amount; Damages: $2,454.09; Costs: $55.00; Total: $2509.09; Party: Names: Augustine, Mark J; Milpitas Sanitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Alvarenga, Dania; Comment: Mailed 6/29 /18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Alvarenga, Dania; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Fee Paid $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less