This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:32:06 (UTC).

Maribel Sancen vs Roberto Ruiz

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Maribel Sancen filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Roberto Ruiz. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0175

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sancen, Maribel

Respondent

Ruiz, Roberto Villagomez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: (ramon ruiz espita) fl100, fl110

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: community

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: separate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less