Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:40:35 (UTC).

Maria Ramirez vs Carlos Alcala

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Maria Ramirez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Carlos Alcala. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudy, Christopher G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2978

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Rudy, Christopher G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ramirez, Maria Conseulo

Respondent

Alcala, Carlos

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Rudy, Christopher G; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Ramirez, Maria Conseulo; Alcala, Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review - Comment: 12-26-2018. Granted. Sent to the Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (p)separate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: (p)community

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less