Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:43:10 (UTC).

Maria Jimenez vs Leonardo Morales

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by Maria Jimenez against Leonardo Morales in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3680

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

McCracken, JoAnne

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jimenez, Maria Ceja

Respondent and Minor

Morales, Leonardo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Jimenez, Maria Ceja; Morales, Leonardo; Morales, Leonardo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review - Comment: 1-31-2019. Rejected. PP-PU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Request and Order regarding amended mediated agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Order: Mediated Agreement - Comment: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Request: Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Financial Statement (simplified)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: seperate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: community

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less