This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/23/2022 at 02:53:15 (UTC).

Maria Gonzalez vs Sephora USA Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Maria Gonzalez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sephora USA Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0669

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Gonzalez

Defendants

Sephora USA Inc.

J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeff B. Atterbury

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/1/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

11/1/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/1/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

2/1/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Maria Gonzalez,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Maria Gonzalez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Maria Gonzalez,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Maria Gonzalez,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.C PENNEY CORPORATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SEPHORA USA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ATTERBURY, JEFF B.