This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 22:39:24 (UTC).

Maria Buenrostro vs Vernisa Washington

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 Maria Buenrostro filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Vernisa Washington. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8711

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Buenrostro

Defendant

Vernisa Washington

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/13/2019 Minute Order

Minute Order

6/26/2019 Minute Order

Notice: New Hearing Date & Order on Reissuance

6/25/2019 Notice: New Hearing Date & Order on Reissuance

Proof of Service: Personal

6/7/2019 Proof of Service: Personal

Declaration: Non-Service

5/22/2019 Declaration: Non-Service

Declaration: Re: Diligence

5/22/2019 Declaration: Re: Diligence

Minute Order

5/22/2019 Minute Order

Notice: New Hearing Date & Order on Reissuance

5/21/2019 Notice: New Hearing Date & Order on Reissuance

Request: Restraining Order

4/29/2019 Request: Restraining Order

Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment

4/29/2019 Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment

Declaration: In Support

4/29/2019 Declaration: In Support

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order: Temporary Restraining Order

4/29/2019 Order: Temporary Restraining Order

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV; Department: Department 11; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV; Department: Department 11; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Continued: Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: New Hearing Date & Order on Reissuance; Filed By: Maria Buenrostro,; Comment: Granted - reissued to 8-13-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Personal; Filed By: Maria Buenrostro,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Re: Diligence; Filed By: Maria Buenrostro,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Non-Service; Filed By: Maria Buenrostro,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV; Department: Department 11; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Continued: Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: New Hearing Date & Order on Reissuance; Filed By: Maria Buenrostro,; Comment: REISSUED: 06/25/19 @ 9AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Temporary Restraining Order; Filed By: Maria Buenrostro,; Comment: GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Maria Buenrostro,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Maria Buenrostro,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment; Filed By: Maria Buenrostro,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Restraining Order; Filed By: Maria Buenrostro,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less