This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:13:04 (UTC).

Amargo, et al. v. Santa Clara Valley Water District, et al. (Consolidated Action/Lead Case)

Case Summary

On 01/23/2018 Amargo filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Santa Clara Valley Water District, Consolidated Action/Lead Case. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stoelker, James L and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2210

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stoelker, James L

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Madrigal, Aaron

Amargo, Maria

Montano, Blanca

Guzman, Saul

Madrigal, Edwin

Mata, Dulce

Amargo, Jose

Trang, Sang

Vann, Brian

Souza, Renee

Madrigal, Paulino

Machuca, Ramon

Caballero, Ulrika

Smith, Gordon

Lopez, Samantha

Lopez, Armando

Noel, Jolene

Huynh, Anh Thi

Wilson, Anna Lisa

Madrigal, Justin

219 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hawes, Amanda

Other Attorneys

Kiniyalocts, Melissa Renee

Lo, Amy W

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

Bussey, Jason Matthew

Walker, Evan W

Oneal, Jeffrey Frank

 

Court Documents

Notice

Notice CMC reset to 6-8-18 at 10am in D19: Comment: CMC reset to 6/8/18 at 10am in D19

Order

Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to Dept 19: Comment: Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to Dept 19, Hon. Peter H. Kirwan presiding - signed/TCZ

Declaration: In Support

Declaration In Support Jeffrey F. Oneal: Comment: Jeffrey F. Oneal

Affidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6

Affidavit Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6 (BCW): Comment: CCP 170.6 as to Hon. Brian C. Walsh

Order

Order Disclosure Statement: Comment: Disclosure Statement - signed/BCW

Order

Order & Notice Reassignment to D1 and CMC reset: Comment: Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to Department 1; CMC reset to 6/8/18 at 10am in Department 1 - signed/BCW

Order

Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case: Comment: Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case - signed/TEK

Notice: Related Cases

Notice Related Cases:

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Amargo FAC Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf: Comment: COMPLEX

Motion: Strike

Motion Strike: Comment: HRG 10/26/18

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Memorandum Points and Authorities: Comment: HRG 10/26/18

Demurrer

Demurrer: Comment: Demurrer to Amended Consolidated Complaint HRG 10/26/18

Notice

Notice CMC 10-5-18 at 10am in D19: Comment: CMC set for 10/5/18 at 10am in D19 (16 related cases)

Summons: Issued/Filed

Amargo CAC Summons for CA DWR.pdf: Comment: Amargo CAC Summons

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons Issued Filed:

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Amargo CAC Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf:

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order for Filing Amended Consolidated Complaint: Comment: Stipulation & Order for Filing Amended Consolidated Complaint - signed/PK

Complaint: Amended

Complaint Amended (Consolidated Complaint): Comment: Consolidated Complaint

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice CMC 11-1-19 at 10am in D19: Comment: CMC set for 11/1/19 at 10am in D19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Order Submitted Matter HRG 5-31-19: Comment: Order After Hearings on 5/31/19 - signed/PHK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice CMC 7-19-19 at 10am in D19: Comment: CMC set for 7/19/19 at 10am in D19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Hearing: Other - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Demurrers to Omnibus Complaint filed by (1) Defendant California Department of Water Resources and its Division of Safety of Dams; (2) Defendant City of San Jose; (3) County of Santa Clara. Motions to Strike the Omnibus Complaint filed by (1) Defendant California Department of Water Resources and its Division of Safety of Dams; (2) Defendant City of San Jose; (3) Defendant Santa Clara Valley Water District. Case Management Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Tentative Ruling for Hearings on 5-31-19: Comment: Tentative Ruling for Hearings on 5/31/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice CMC 5-31-19 at 10am in D19: Comment: CMC set for 5/31/19 at 10am in D19

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Order Disclosure Statement: Comment: Disclosure Statement - signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Order & Notice Reassignment to D1 and CMC reset: Comment: Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to Department 1; CMC reset to 6/8/18 at 10am in Department 1 - signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case: Comment: Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case - signed/TEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: Related Cases - Notice Related Cases:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Amargo FAC Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf: Comment: COMPLEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Complaint: Amended - Comment: FIRST; Atty Hawes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 deposited for all plfs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: *no summons issued*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.