This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 12:01:07 (UTC).

Marco Garcia et al vs Hal Hawthorne et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 Marco Garcia filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Hal Hawthorne. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5806

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marco Garcia

Luz Elena Garcia

Daniel Garcia

Defendants

Hal Edwin Hawthorne

Cynthia Ann Hidalgo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Doris Y. Youmara

Defendant Attorney

Steven Craig Toschi

 

Court Documents

Clerk Rejection Letter

12/9/2021 Clerk Rejection Letter

Minute Order

11/30/2021 Minute Order

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

11/1/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Request: Dismissal

8/17/2021 Request: Dismissal

Summons: Issued/Filed

8/17/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

8/17/2021 Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

7/15/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/15/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Conference: Further Case Management

3/15/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/23/2021 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Demand: Jury Trial

12/10/2021 Demand: Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: Cynthia Hidalgo,; Comment: $150 paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Demand: Jury Trial; Filed By: Cynthia Hidalgo,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Comment: The $150 fees were not attached. resubmit with the correct Fees.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Cynthia Hidalgo,; Comment: Answer to Complaint Garcia; Atty: Toschi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Marco Garcia,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Marco Garcia, Hal Hawthorne, Luz Garcia, Marco Garcia, Daniel Garcia,; Comment: of Hal Edwin Hawthorne from Complaint ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal; Filed By: Marco Garcia, Hal Hawthorne, Luz Garcia, Marco Garcia, Daniel Garcia,; Comment: atty Youmara, without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Marco Garcia, Luz Garcia, Marco Garcia, Daniel Garcia,; Comment: Summons on First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Filed By: Marco Garcia, Luz Garcia, Marco Garcia, Daniel Garcia,; Comment: First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Marco Garcia,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Marco Garcia,; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Marco Garcia,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOSCHI STEVEN CRAIG