Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:42:41 (UTC).

Marco Aguirre vs San Jose Harley Davidson et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Marco Aguirre filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against San Jose Harley Davidson. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2485

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aguirre, Marco

Defendants

Doe Manfacturer, John

San Jose Harley Davidson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bassett, William H

Defendant Attorney

Kronenberg, William Scott

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Comment: appt. pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: To Complaint Atty: Kronenberg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: on 1st Amended Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: 1st Amended Complaint. atty: Bassett.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG 11/6/18 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less