This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 10:31:25 (UTC).

Marcela I. Arrieta and Fernando J. Cocio, Jr.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2014 Marcela I Arrieta and Fernando J Cocio, Jr was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph, Irwin and Pennypacker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2455

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Joseph, Irwin

Pennypacker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marcela I. Arrieta

Gilroy, CA 95020

Petitioner

Arrieta, Marcela I.

Defendant

Fernando J. Cocio, Jr.

Respondent

Cocio, Jr., Fernando J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Fee Waiver -P 12-01-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Fee Waiver - P 01-26-15 to 02-26-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 03/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Text = Reconsideration Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 02/26/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = (R) 1st paper fees $435 due on/before 1-31-15 Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = D Closed = 01/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • Response: Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Response DS/NL/LS Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = re: Ptn, summs, blank resp. Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/08/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 12/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 12/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 12/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 12/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • Petition: Dissolution no minor - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage/No minor Decision = M Closed = 12/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less