Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 02:00:31 (UTC).

Mai Tran vs Pushpinder Setia

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 Mai Tran filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Pushpinder Setia. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Yep, Steven L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4340

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Yep, Steven L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tran, Mai

Defendant

Setia, Pushpinder S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Tran, Mai; Awarded Against: Setia, Pushpinder S; Amount; Damages: $3,027.86; Costs: $135.95; Total: $3163.81; Comment: Exhibits returned in open court; Party: Names: Tran, Mai; Setia, Pushpinder S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Judgment: Satisfaction - Comment: Paid in Full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Fee Paid $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee) - Comment: Reset req'd by plt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Declaration: Re: Diligence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less