Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:47:21 (UTC).

Mahdi Schindelheim vs Lee Parkinson et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2018 Mahdi Schindelheim filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Lee Parkinson. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0549

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Schindelheim, Mahdi

Defendants

Parkinson, Lee

Rutledge, Mark

MCAFEE INC. a California Corporation

Successor in Interest to MCAFEE INC.

MCAFEE INC.

MCAFEE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mayo, Frank E.

Defendant Attorney

Paetkau, Tyler M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Schindelheim, Mahdi; MCAFEE LLC; MCAFEE INC.; Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Mayo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Reserved - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Motion for Sanctions by Defendant McAfee Inc. (Tyler Paetkau) 650-645-9014 (Liliane) an 7/17/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Hearing: Motion Summary Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: By Def. Mcafee Inc. (Tyler Paetkau)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Frank Mayo and Tyler M. Paetkau to personally appear; No special or telephonic appearance allow, if Frank Mayo failure to appear at today may result in the dismissal of the case, if Tyler Paetkau failure to appear at today may result Answer being Stricken

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Mayo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Hearing: OSC Sanctions CRC 3.740 Serve - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: *Failure to serve Defs Parkinson and Rutledge* Unserved Defs will be dismissed on next Court date if no POS filed*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Order - Comment: Partial of Dismissal as to Defs Lee Parkinson and Mark Rutledge Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Proof of Service: Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Proof of Service: Electronic - Comment: 10/02/18 Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: 10/02/18 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: McAfee Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: 10/02/18 Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: 10/02/18 Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint for damages Fraud, Neglident Misrepresentation, Violation of Calif. Labor Code sec. 970, Wrongful termination of Employment and Slander

    Read MoreRead Less