This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 06:47:59 (UTC).

Madriz v. Premier International Group, Inc. (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Madriz filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Premier International Group, Inc Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7296

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Veronica Madriz

Defendants

Premier International Group, Inc.

WYNDHAM GARDEN HOTEL

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jean-Claude Lapuyade

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

11/29/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/29/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/29/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

11/30/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/15/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Summons: Issued/Filed

11/29/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/29/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/29/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

11/30/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/15/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Premier International Group, Inc.,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Veronica Madriz,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Veronica Madriz,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Veronica Madriz,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant