This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/21/2022 at 10:52:09 (UTC).

M. Veron, et al vs J. O'Hearon

Case Summary

On 04/01/2009 M Veron filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against J O'Hearon. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Madden, James P and Minkus, Leslie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************6132

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Madden, James P

Minkus, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Maxime Veron

Mia Leila Dehdar

Dehdar, Mia Leila

Veron, Maxime

Defendants

James O'Hearon

O'Hearon, James

O'Hearon Properties

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2009
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Filed By: Maxime Veron,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec/Rtn Partially Satis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2009
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Order of Examination; Department: Department 86; Time: 1:15PM; Result: Heard: Claim disallowed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Claim of Exemption; Department: Department 86; Time: 1:15PM; Result: Continued: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2009
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: Maxime Veron,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Memo of Costs/after Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2009
  • DocketDescription: Claim of Exemption; Filed By: James O'Hearon,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Claim of Exempt/Financial Stmnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: James O'Hearon,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2009
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Hearing on Claim of Exemption; Filed By: Maxime Veron,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Hrg:Claim of Exemption

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2009
  • DocketDescription: Abstract of Judgment: Issued; Filed By: Maxime Veron,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: James O'Hearon,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Issued); Filed By: Mia Dehdar,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • DocketDescription: Application: Order of Examination; Filed By: Maxime Veron,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Produce Statement Closed = 09/11/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: Maxime Veron, Mia Dehdar,; Comment: Text = ok to amend claim to add O'Hearon Properties as defandant DBA per comm James Madden Legacy Name = SC Order of Court Decision = M Closed = 07/02/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • DocketDescription: Request: Court Order (Small Claims); Filed By: Maxime Veron, Mia Dehdar,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Court Order & Answer Decision = M Closed = 06/19/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 86; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Heard: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: James O'Hearon,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000; Filed By: Mia Dehdar,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $5001-$7500 Decision = M Closed = 05/04/2009

    Read MoreRead Less