This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 06/07/2022 at 00:16:39 (UTC).

M. Russo Vs Core Development

Case Summary

On 02/26/2004 M Russo filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Core Development. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Manoukian, Socrates P, Jacobs-May, Jamie, Herlihy, John F and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5085

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Manoukian, Socrates P

Jacobs-May, Jamie

Herlihy, John F

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Yet Classified

Manuel Russo

Russo, Manuel

Sp Commercial Real Estate

John P. Cardosi

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

Stan Perry

Sp Commercial Real Estate

Perry, Stan

Cross Plaintiff, Defendant and Not Yet Classified

Sp Commercial Real Estate

Cross Defendants

Core Development Inc.

Mills, Patricia L.

Russo, Manuel

Patricia L. Mills

Arbitrator

Cardosi, John P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Martin R. Deutsch

440 North First Street, Suite 200

San Jose, CA 95112

Deutsch, Martin R.

Martin Robert Deutsch

Widman, Jeffrey P.

Not Yet Classified and Defendant Attorneys

Grayson S. Taketa

1764 The Alameda

San Jose, CA 95126-1729

Linda Ann Ritchie

Dennis P. Isaac Law Offices

121 Spear Street, Ste.410, Two Rincon Center

San Francisco, CA 94105

Teraoka & Partners , LLP

Taketa, Grayson S.

Ritchie, Linda A.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Taketa, Grayson S.

Ritchie, Linda A.

Not Yet Classified and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Martin Robert Deutsch

Grayson S. Taketa

1764 The Alameda

San Jose, CA 95126-1729

Linda Ann Ritchie

Other Attorneys

Jeffrey P. Widman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2005
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Department: Department 4; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Vacated; dismissal filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2005
  • HearingDescription: Review: Arbitration Order; Department: Department 4; Time: 10:15AM; Result: Settled: before mediation hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2005
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Manuel Russo,; Comment: Text = filed by Atty: Sosan Akbar/Martin Deutsch Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 10/05/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2005
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Settlement; Filed By: Manuel Russo,; Comment: Text = conditional settlement/atty Martin Deutsch Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement Decision = M Closed = 09/27/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2005
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Hearing; Comment: Legacy Name = ARB-Ntc of Arb Ord Rev Hearing Decision = M Closed = 09/02/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2005
  • HearingDescription: Review: Arbitration Order; Department: Department 4; Time: 10:15AM; Result: Heard: Continued (Event)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2005
  • DocketDescription: General Denial (no fees); Filed By: Patricia Mills,; Comment: Text = amended. Atty Akbar Legacy Name = CV General Denial w/out fees Decision = M Closed = 06/30/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2005
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation; Filed By: Core Development Inc., SP Commercial Real Estate, Stan Perry,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Stipulation Decision = M Closed = 06/10/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2005
  • DocketDescription: Default Pending; Filed By: Core Development Inc., SP Commercial Real Estate, Stan Perry,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Default Pending Decision = M Closed = 05/26/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2005
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Filed By: Core Development Inc., SP Commercial Real Estate,; Comment: Text = **NOT ENTERED** no summons or proof of service of cross-complaint Legacy Name = CV Req:Entry of Default Decision = M Closed = 06/03/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2004
  • DocketDescription: Cross-Complaint; Filed By: Manuel Russo, Core Development Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = Cross-Complaint Decision = M Closed = 04/02/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2004
  • DocketDescription: General Denial: Unlimited; Filed By: Manuel Russo, Core Development Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = General Denial, Unltd Decision = M Closed = 04/02/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2004
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: SP Commercial Real Estate,; Comment: Legacy Name = Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 04/01/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2004
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Manuel Russo, Core Development Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = Proof of Service/Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 03/16/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2004
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Manuel Russo, Stan Perry,; Comment: Legacy Name = Proof of Service/Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 03/05/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2004
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Manuel Russo, SP Commercial Real Estate,; Comment: Legacy Name = Proof of Service/Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 03/05/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2004
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Pendency of Action; Filed By: Manuel Russo,; Comment: Legacy Name = Ntc Pendency of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2004
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2004
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Manuel Russo, Core Development Inc., SP Commercial Real Estate, Stan Perry,; Comment: Legacy Name = Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 02/26/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2004
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Manuel Russo, Core Development Inc., SP Commercial Real Estate, Stan Perry,; Comment: Text = atty: Sosan Akbar Legacy Name = Complaint Filed; Summons Issued Decision = M Closed = 02/26/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Core Development, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WIDMAN, JEFFREY P.