This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/07/2018 at 14:48:25 (UTC).

M. Rangel vs M. Tomas, et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2008 M Rangel filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against M Tomas. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zepeda, Carrie, Murphy, Kevin J, Pierce, Mark H, Strickland, Elizabeth and Emerson, James. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0673

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zepeda, Carrie

Murphy, Kevin J

Pierce, Mark H

Strickland, Elizabeth

Emerson, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marco Antonio Rangel

Rangel, Marco Antonio

Claimant

County Of Santa Clara

Defendants

Michael Joseph Tomas

Joe Tomas

Tomas, Michael Joseph

Tomas, Joe

Not Classified By Court

Cesc Neutral Jonathan Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony R. Lopez, Jr.

22440 Clarendon Street, 2Nd Floor

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Lopez, Anthony R., Jr.

Claimant Attorney

Hing, Eric

Defendant Attorneys

Melanie D. Johnson

1740 Technology Drive, Suite 250

San Jose, CA 95110

Johnson, Melanie D.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Lee, Jonathan L.

Other Attorneys

Eric Hing

70 West Hedding St., East Wing 9Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95110-1770

Jonathan L. Lee

227 North First Street, Suite 300

San Jose, CA 95113

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: CESC Neutral Jonathan Lee; Party: Name: County Of Santa Clara; Party: Name: Tomas, Joe; Party: Name: Tomas, Michael Joseph; Party: Name: Rangel, Marco Antonio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • Review: Case Status - Original Type: Review: Case Status; Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Vacated; dismissal filed; Comment: Text = Re: Settlement *1st continuance* Result By = C Result Judge = MHP - Pierce, Mark Result Date = 04/11/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • Request: Dismissal CESC - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Req Dism w/Prej (CESC) Decision = M Closed = 04/11/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Comment: Text = filed by Attorney Anthony R. Lopez Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 04/11/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2011
  • Review: Case Status - Original Type: Review: Case Status; Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Text = Re: Settlement *Telephonic Appearance by Anthony R. Lopez, Jr. for Plt Marco Antonio Rangel* Result By = C Result Judge = MHP - Pierce, Mark Result Date = 03/17/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2011
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Further Case Management; Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Set for:; Comment: Text = Set per Court *Telephonic Appearance by Anthony R. Lopez, Jr. for Plt Marco Antonio Rangel* Result By = C Result Judge = MHP - Pierce, Mark Result Date = 01/11/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Comment: Text = Anthony R. Lopez, jr Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 12/17/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Original Type: Jury Trial: Long Cause; Judicial Officer: Zepeda, Carrie; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard: Settled; Comment: Text = Est. 5 Days Result By = C Result Judge = CZ - Zepeda, Carrie Result Date = 11/10/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Comment: Text = of melanie johnson re: opposition to mtn in limine to excluded liens Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 11/10/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • Opposition/Objections - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Comment: Text = Opposition to mtn to exclude reference to lien Legacy Name = CV Opposition Decision = M Closed = 11/10/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2009
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Emerson, James; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 06/09/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2009
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Emerson, James; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 06/09/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2009
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Emerson, James; Comment: Text = Anthony R. Lopez, jr. Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 06/08/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2009
  • Demand: Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Emerson, James; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Demand for Jury Trial Decision = M Closed = 06/05/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2009
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Emerson, James; Comment: Text = atty johnson Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 06/05/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2009
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Set for: further CMC; Comment: Text = *Telephonic Appearance by Anthony R. Lopez, Jr. for Plt Arangel* Result By = C Result Judge = ES7 - Strickland, Elizabeth Result Date = 05/12/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Emerson, James; Comment: Text = Atty Lopez Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 04/22/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2008
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Emerson, James; Comment: Text = Atty Lopez Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 12/19/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2008
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Emerson, James; Comment: Text = Atty Lopez Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 12/19/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2008
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Emerson, James; Comment: Text = Atty Lopez Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 12/19/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee, Jonathan L.