This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 01:41:07 (UTC).

Mark Ramsey Vs Julie Buller

Case Summary

On 09/19/2014 Mark Ramsey filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Julie Buller. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Manoukian, Socrates P, Stoelker, James L, Kirwan, Peter, Overton, Carol, Zayner, Theodore C, Strickland, Elizabeth and Folan, Maureen A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0841

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Manoukian, Socrates P

Stoelker, James L

Kirwan, Peter

Overton, Carol

Zayner, Theodore C

Strickland, Elizabeth

Folan, Maureen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Mark Ramsey

Sandra Ramsey

Derivatively On Behalf Of Crime Alert Monitoring Center, Inc.

Ramsey, Mark

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Crime Alert Monitoring Center, Inc.

Julie Buller

Buller, Julie

Not Classified By Court

Jacobs-May, Jamie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Daniel J. Muller

160 West Santa Clara St., Suite 1575

San Jose, CA 95113

Burleson, Gerald Patrick

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Sullivan, Randy

Clayton, William B., Jr.

Clayton & McEvoy PC

Bennett, Joshua A.

Roux, Henry W.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

McMonigle, David Sean

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2018
  • Court Trial - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Comment: EST. 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Conference: Settlement - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Reserved - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: mtn to amend complt by Plt (Gerald P. Burleson) Thaise 6858-794-4805

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • Motion: Compel - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Compliance with the Mediation Agreement by Plt Mark Ramsey (Gerald Burleson)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: OF MARK RAMSEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Separate Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Memorandum: Points and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: OF GERALD P. BURLESON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Motion (Amended) - Comment: To compel; Atty Burleson, 03/13/2018, 9AM, D19

    Read MoreRead Less
191 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2014
  • Memorandum: Points and Authorities - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Memo:Ps & As/Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • Motion: Compel - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = Discovery Responses 1/09/15 @ 9:00AM D-19 Atty Muller Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn to Compel Decision = M Closed = 12/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = Atty Roux. Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 11/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 10/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = ***STRICKEN per 4/1/15 Order*** H. Roux Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 10/23/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 10/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 09/30/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 09/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 09/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 09/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less