This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 16:25:00 (UTC).

M. Kureshi vs A. Russell, et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2010 M Kureshi filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against A Russell. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Madden, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************7238

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Munir Kureshi

Cupertino, CA 95014

Cupertino Animal Hospital

Kureshi, Munir

Defendants

Alan Russell

Cupertino, CA 95014

Stephanie Russell

Cupertino, CA 95014

Russell, Stephanie

Russell, Alan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Russell, Stephanie; Party: Name: Russell, Alan; Party: Name: Kureshi, Munir

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Russell, Stephanie; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Russell, Alan; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Kureshi, Munir; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Kureshi, Munir; Judgment Amount: $1,139.27; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Russell, Alan; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $115.00; Other: $1,024.27; Total: $1139.27; Comment: printdate=Aug 6 2010; origjudgdate=Aug 5 2010; judgstatusdate=Aug 6 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Russell, Stephanie; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Russell, Alan; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Kureshi, Munir; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2010
  • Judgment: Satisfaction - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Acknowledge Satisfaction of Jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 08/05/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 06/21/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Fictitious Business Name Decision = M Closed = 06/21/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $0-$1500 Decision = M Closed = 08/06/2010

    Read MoreRead Less