This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 11:57:06 (UTC).

M. Klein vs Direct Capital Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/19/2005 M Klein filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Direct Capital Group, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Saldivar, Gregory H and Triplett, John R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3056

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Saldivar, Gregory H

Triplett, John R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mark Klein

Los Altos, CA 94024

Klein, Mark

Defendants

Direct Capital Group, Inc.

17330 Brookhurst Street, Suite 370

Fountain Valley, CA 92708

Dunn Voyer

Fountain Valley, CA 92708

Voyer, Dunn

Financedirect.Com

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Voyer, Dunn; Party: Name: Voyer, Dunn; Party: Name: Direct Capital Group, Inc.; Party: Name: Klein, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Triplett, John R; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Voyer, Dunn; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Voyer, Dunn; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Direct Capital Group, Inc.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Klein, Mark; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Voyer, Dunn; Awarded Against: Klein, Mark; Comment: clerkid=443; printdate=Feb 21 2006; freetext=DEFT does not owe PLTF any money on PLTF's claim.; origjudgdate=Feb 10 2006; judgstatusdate=Feb 21 2006; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2005
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Direct Capital Group, Inc.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Klein, Mark; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2006
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2006
  • Request to Correct or Vacate Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Correct/Vacate Jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2006
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Saldivar, Gregory H; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JRT - Triplett, John Result Date = 02/10/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2006
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 02/22/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2006
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2005
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Addl Plts and Defs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2005
  • Defendant's Claim (Amended) (No change in claim amount) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Amend Plaintiff's Claim Decision = M Closed = 12/28/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2005
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 12/19/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2005
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff's Claim/>12,non-Gov

    Read MoreRead Less