This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 06/14/2022 at 18:07:26 (UTC).

Lynsey Hobbs et al vs Essential Brands, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 Lynsey Hobbs filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Essential Brands, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7177

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lynsey Hobbs

Patricia Viruegas

Defendants

Essential Brands, Inc.

Appletree Learning Center, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd M. Friedman

Defendant Attorney

Linda Moin Moroney

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/15/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/15/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/15/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

6/9/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Essential Brands, Inc.,; Comment: to complaint: atty Moroney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Lynsey Hobbs, Patricia Viruegas,; Comment: Complaint (Case Initiation)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Lynsey Hobbs, Patricia Viruegas,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Comment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Lynsey Hobbs, Patricia Viruegas,; Comment: Summons (Summons)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moroney, Linda Moin