This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 11:54:07 (UTC).

Lydia Callaghan vs Adam Weiss

Case Summary

On 01/08/2018 Lydia Callaghan filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Adam Weiss. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Franco, Jose S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0075

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Franco, Jose S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Callaghan, Lydia

Respondent

Weiss, Adam

Minors

Weiss, Faye

Weiss, Madeleine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DeLacey, Charles Howard

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Franco, Jose S; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Callaghan, Lydia; Weiss, Adam; Weiss, Faye; Weiss, Madeleine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2018
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2018
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2018
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Request: Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Comment: DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE ANDINCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION-PRELIMINARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final) - Comment: Dec Service of Disclosure (Final)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Comment: DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Comment: Petition for Dissolution (Divorce) of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: SUMMONS (Family Law)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less