This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 07/31/2019 at 03:11:49 (UTC).

LWGC, Inc. V. Maselli, Et Al.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2009 LWGC, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Maselli. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stoelker, James L, Kirwan, Peter, Murphy, Kevin J, Monahan, William, Elfving, William J, Kleinberg, James P, Strickland, Elizabeth, Levinger, Mary Jo, Arand, Mary E, Herlihy, John F and Huber, Joseph H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3483

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stoelker, James L

Kirwan, Peter

Murphy, Kevin J

Monahan, William

Elfving, William J

Kleinberg, James P

Strickland, Elizabeth

Levinger, Mary Jo

Arand, Mary E

Herlihy, John F

Huber, Joseph H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Lwgc Inc

Wurzel, Thomas

Blomberg Building Materials, Inc.

DLM Plastering Co, Inc.

Robeck's Welding & Fabrication, Inc.

Stuart, Christopher

Michael Ross Consulting Engineer

Nature's Reflections

JMC Construction

Tiller, Darcy

XCAV8

Moffitt, William

Stanley, Roger

MD Flooring

Defendants

Stuart Plumbing

Fountain Of Youth Plumbing

Kathryn Maselli

David Maselli

Kathryn Teng

Teng, Kathryn

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

Teng, Kathryn

DLM Plastering Co, Inc.

37 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Fenech, Joseph M.

Jones, Shannon B.

Jones, Todd A.

Menekshe, Ayhan M.

Saccone, Leland J.

Sherwood, Laurie E.

Donahue Bates Blakemore Et Al

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Robinson & Wood, Inc.

227 North First Street, Suite 300

San Jose, CA 95113

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Menekshe, Ayhan M.

Saccone, Leland J.

Robinson & Wood, Inc.

227 North First Street, Suite 300

San Jose, CA 95113

Other Attorneys

Joseph M. Fenech

120

Monterey, CA 93940

Neutral William H. Gavin

Ropers Majeski Kohn & Bentley

Pietrykowski, Michael J.

Van De Poel Levy & Allen LLP

Pezold, Daniel G.

Agajanian, Tim M.

Gavin, William H.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2013
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: Maselli, Kathryn; Party: Name: American Contractors Indemnity Company; Party: Name: XCAV8; Party: Name: Foothill Air Conditioning & Heating; Party: Name: Moffitt, William; Party: Name: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company; Party: Name: Del Castillo, Richard; Party: Name: Renner Surveying & Engineering, Inc.; Party: Name: Nature's Reflections; Party: Name: Grace Construction Products; Party: Name: W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn; Party: Name: Bay City Tile; Party: Name: Vanstana Ltd.; Party: Name: Robert Hunt, Inc.; Party: Name: Thompson, Brian; Party: Name: Brian Thompson Drywall; Party: Name: Ross, Michael; Party: Name: Roof Guard Roofing Company, Inc.; Party: Name: Stanley, Roger; Party: Name: MD Flooring; Party: Name: Madueno, Juan C.; Party: Name: Davis, Dan; Party: Name: Heritage Concrete Construction; Party: Name: Blomberg Building Materials, Inc.; Party: Name: Tiller, Darcy; Party: Name: Fountain Of Youth Plumbing; Party: Name: Dells's Heating & Air; Party: Name: Fernandez, Delmis; Party: Name: Robeck's Welding & Fabrication, Inc.; Party: Name: TKR Construction, Inc.; Party: Name: Stuart, Christopher; Party: Name: Stuart Plumbing; Party: Name: Palmieri, Mike; Party: Name: San Carlos Glass & Mirror; Party: Name: Warner, Beverly; Party: Name: Wurzel, Thomas; Party: Name: Teng, Kathryn; Party: Name: Maselli, David; Party: Name: LWGC Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: Gator Home Tech, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: DLM Plastering Co, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 10/15/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Original Type: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Vacated; dismissal filed; Comment: Text = Continued from 8-29-13 Result By = K Result Judge = PK - Kirwan, Peter Result Date = 08/30/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = Atty Cardinal Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 09/03/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Original Type: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Text = Continued from 6-20-13 by Court Result By = C Result Judge = MEA - Arand, Mary Result Date = 08/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = Cross-Complaint filed by DLM Plastering Co., Inc. on 9-10-12 (Atty Saccone) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = Cross-complaints still on file (Party "DLM Plastering Co, Inc." filed a 1st amended cross-complaint on 9/10/12) You cannot dismiss entire action until all cross-complaints have been dismissed. Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr Decision = M Closed = 08/27/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Original Type: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Text = *Telephonic Appearance by Laurie E. Sherwood for Def/X-Complt Roebeck's Welding; and Joseph M. Fenech for X-Defs LWGC, Inc., etal* Result By = C Result Judge = PK - Kirwan, Peter Result Date = 06/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
651 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2009
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Herlihy, John F; Comment: Text = of david maselli in supp of exparte (karic) Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 07/10/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Herlihy, John F; Comment: Text = of counsel christopher k. karic in supp of exparte appl Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 07/10/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Herlihy, John F; Comment: Text = for ost for mtn to remove mechanics' lien (c. karic) Legacy Name = CV Ex Parte Appl Decision = M Closed = 07/10/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = on x-cmplt Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 07/09/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = on x-cmplt Legacy Name = CV Summons Issued Decision = M Closed = 07/09/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • Cross-Complaint - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = J. J. Borger Legacy Name = CV Cross-Complaint Decision = M Closed = 07/09/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = J. J. Borger Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 07/09/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2009
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 05/28/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2009
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 05/28/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 05/28/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lwgc, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DLM PLASTERING COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PS FLOORING is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neutral William H. Gavin