This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2022 at 02:09:43 (UTC).

LW Neufeld & Associates Inc. vs Bay Area Tax Pros Inc

Case Summary

On 08/05/2008 LW Neufeld Associates Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Bay Area Tax Pros Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************9795

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lw Neufeld & Associates Inc.

Defendant

Bay Area Tax Pros Inc

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2009
  • DocketDescription: Order: Submitted Matter; Filed By: LW Neufeld & Associates Inc., Bay Area Tax Pros Inc,; Comment: Text = Defendant does not owe plaintiff any money on plaintiff's claim. Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = M Closed = 02/02/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 58; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Heard: Taken Under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • DocketDescription: Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party; Filed By: LW Neufeld & Associates Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 02/02/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • DocketDescription: Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party; Filed By: Bay Area Tax Pros Inc,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 02/02/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2008
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 58; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Continued: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of Mailing; Filed By: LW Neufeld & Associates Inc., Bay Area Tax Pros Inc,; Comment: Text = Defendant's Request for Continuance was received less than 10 days before the court date. There is not sufficient time to review your request and notify both parties. Your request will be submitted with the file at the court hearing. IF YOU ARE NOT PRESENT AT THE HEARING: if your request is granted, you will be notified by mail; if your request is denied, the case may be heard as a default in your absence. Legacy Name = SC Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2008
  • DocketDescription: Request: Postponement (Small Claims); Filed By: Bay Area Tax Pros Inc,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Continuance/After Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 58; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Continued: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: LW Neufeld & Associates Inc.,; Comment: Text = personal service Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • DocketDescription: Document: Other; Comment: Text = Request for Action/Order of Court Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of Mailing; Filed By: LW Neufeld & Associates Inc., Bay Area Tax Pros Inc,; Comment: Text = The Commissioner has reviewed the continuance request from the Defendant. As of the date of this letter, the Plaintiff has not filed proof of service. The Commissioner has stated that the Defendant's request to reschedule will be addressed if/when the Plaintiff files the proof of service. The Defendant need not appear for the hearing scheduled for 9-18-08. If the proof of service is filed timely, the litigants will be noticed by mail of the rescheduled hearing date. If the proof of service is not filed timely prior to the hearing, the matter will be addressed at the scheduled hearing. If the Plaintiff is not present at the hearing, the matter may be dismissed. Legacy Name = SC Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2008
  • DocketDescription: Request: Postponement (Small Claims); Filed By: Bay Area Tax Pros Inc,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Continuance/After Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2008
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2008
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000; Filed By: LW Neufeld & Associates Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 08/05/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less