Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:05:02 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs Hsinmei Huang

Case Summary

On 01/10/2018 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hsinmei Huang. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1642

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

Defendant

Huang, Hsinmei

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zide, Flint Corey

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: LVNV Funding LLC; Huang, Hsinmei; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Declaration: Non-Service - Comment: declaration of non service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Declaration: Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: non military status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Affidavit: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less