This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:51:15 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs Gina Bagley

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gina Bagley. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudy, Christopher G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6102

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Rudy, Christopher G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

Defendant

Bagley, Gina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brodbeck, Lori D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Rudy, Christopher G; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court (CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: LVNV Funding LLC; Awarded Against: Bagley, Gina; Amount; Damages: $1,710.36; Costs: $364.00; Total: $2074.36; Party: Names: LVNV Funding LLC; Bagley, Gina

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: $2074.36 signed by Judge Rudy (e-served 07/24/19 #3172830)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION OF NON MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION RE 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: DECLARATION RE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Default Entered - Comment: (e-served 07/11/19 #3113793)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Declaration: Non-Service - Comment: Gina Bagley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Non Military Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Affidavit - Comment: Declaration of Jurisdictional Facts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less