This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 16:32:13 (UTC).

Luz A. Perez-Torres and Jorge L. Ortiz Montanez

Case Summary

On 04/03/2014 Luz A Perez-Torres and Jorge L Ortiz Montanez was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph, Irwin, Pennypacker, Philip H and Huber, Joseph H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2154

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Joseph, Irwin

Pennypacker, Philip H

Huber, Joseph H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luz Aurora Perez-Torres

Gilroy, CA 95020

Petitioner

Perez-Torres, Luz Aurora

Defendant

Jorge Luis Ortiz Montanez

Respondent

Ortiz Montanez, Jorge Luis

Minor

Ortiz, Sasha Mari

Not Classified By Court

County Of Santa Clara

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Name: Ortiz Montanez, Jorge Luis; Party: Name: Perez-Torres, Luz Aurora; Party: Name: Ortiz, Sasha Mari

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Judicial Custody Conf - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: (P) by agrmnt..sb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Findings & Order After Hearing - Comment: custody/visitations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: jcc statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • JCC Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Copy of FCS JCC Referral Self Rep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Copy of FCS JCC Referral Self Rep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Copy of FCS JCC MEMO 5-19-16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2014
  • Order: After Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Order After Status Conf Decision = M Closed = 07/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 05/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • Bulk Scanned Documents - Comment: Bulk Scan 04-03-14 to 10-01-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Luz A. Perez-Torres and Jorge L. Ortiz Montanez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 04/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 04/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 04/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 04/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 04/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 04/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less