This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 15:30:57 (UTC).

Luis Estrada et al vs Angelina Serrano

Case Summary

On 02/03/2016 Luis Estrada filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Angelina Serrano. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Yep, Steven L and Elfving, William J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3392

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Yep, Steven L

Elfving, William J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Estrada, Luis

San Jose, CA 95111

Sarmiento, Erika

San Jose, CA 95111

Defendant

Serrano, Angelina

San Jose, CA 95125

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Estrada, Luis; Sarmiento, Erika; Awarded Against: Serrano, Angelina; Amount; Damages: $10,000.00; Costs: $150.00; Total: $10150.00; Comment: Judgment is joint and several; Party: Names: Estrada, Luis; Sarmiento, Erika; Serrano, Angelina; Comment: **Notice of Entry of Judgment - Date of Mailing 4/21/16**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Acknowledgement - Comment: of Satisfaction of Judgment in FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Bulk Scanned Documents - Comment: 02/03/16-05/15/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: BW OEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: POS on Civil Warrant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Warrant: Returned and Filed - Comment: BW for Angelina Serrano, Written promise to appear; hearing set for 05/15/17..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Warrant: Issued - Comment: BW for Angelina Serrano & $50.00 Check to Santa Clara Sheriffs Dept.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: on OEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Application: Order of Examination - Comment: OEX Service Copy Handed to Andrew from Legal Pursuit on 08-17-16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Stipulation - Comment: Stipulation: Court Appointed Temporary Judge.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Cause Of Action - Action Damages; File Date: 02/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less