Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 15:53:25 (UTC).

Lucas Mudoh vs Doris Mudoh

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 Lucas Mudoh filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Doris Mudoh. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCracken, JoAnne. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1123

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCracken, JoAnne

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mudoh, Lucas Mbakwa

Respondent

Mudoh, Doris

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Mudoh, Lucas Mbakwa; Mudoh, Doris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review - Comment: 3-27-2019. Rejected. Mailed to the PTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Group Status Conference Calendar - Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Set for Default - LM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: community & quasi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2017
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: ptr separate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant - Comment: re: Ptn fees of $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: community

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: separate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less