Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 09/13/2020 at 06:05:33 (UTC).

Lee v. Google, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 Lee filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Google, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stoelker, James L and Walsh, Brian C. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3651

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stoelker, James L

Walsh, Brian C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lee, Loretta

Defendant

Google, Inc.

Other

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McHenry, Sean Desmond

Defendant Attorneys

Johnsrud, Brian Lee

Sherman, Patrick Michael

Trinh, Maggie W

Other Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order Dismissing Case With Prejudice as to the Pltf and Without Prej as to the Class: Comment: Stipulation & Order Dismissing Case With Prejudice as to the Plaintiff and Without Prejudice as to the Class - signed/BCW

Notice: Entry of Order

Lee - Ntc Entry Order.pdf: Comment: Notice: Entry of Order

Response/Reply

Lee - Repl;y iso 2nd PCA.pdf: Comment: HRG 9/14/18: Reply iso Second Amended Petition to Compel Arbitration

Proof of Service

2018.8.31 POS Arbitration.pdf: Comment: HRG 9/14/18 Proof of Service

Order: Proposed

2018.8.31 Proposed Order.pdf: Comment: HRG 9/14/18 Proposed Order

Declaration

2018.8.31 Decl Lee.pdf: Comment: HRG 9/14/18 Declaration Lee

Declaration

2018.8.31 Decl McHenry.pdf: Comment: HRG 9/14/18 Declaration McHenry

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

2018.8.31 Opp MPA to Arbitration.pdf: Comment: HRG 9/14/18 Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion: Compel Arbitration

Motion Compel Arbitration: Comment: HRG 9/14/18 Second Amended Petition to Compel Arbitration

Notice

Lee - Ntc 2nd Amended PCA.pdf: Comment: HRG 9/14/2018 - Notice of Second Amended Petition to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Judicial Proceedings

Proof of Service

Lee - Proof.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service

Order: Proposed

Lee - Proposed Order re 2nd Amended PCA.pdf: Comment: Proposed Order

Request: Judicial Notice

Request Judicial Notice: Comment: HRG 9/14/18 Request for Judicial Notice iso Second Amended Pet. to Compel Arb.

Declaration

Lee - BLJ Dec iso 2nd PCA.pdf: Comment: HRG 9/14/18 Johnsrud Dec iso Second Amended Pet. to Compel Arb.

Declaration

Lee - Deer Dec iso 2nd PCA.pdf: Comment: HRG 9/14/18 Deer Dec iso Second Amended Pet. to Compel Arb.

Declaration

Lee - Wilson Dec iso 2nd PCA.pdf: Comment: HRG 9/14/18 Wilson Dec iso Second Amended Pet. to Compel Arb.

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Memorandum Points and Authorities: Comment: HRG 9/14/18 Memorandum of Points & Authorities is 2nd PCA

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order to Continue Defendant's Petition to Compel Arbitration: Comment: to Continue Defendant's Petition to Compel Arbitration - signed/BCW

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Stipulation and Order Dismissing Case With Prejudice as to the Pltf and Without Prej as to the Class: Comment: Stipulation & Order Dismissing Case With Prejudice as to the Plaintiff and Without Prejudice as to the Class - signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketClerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Envelope number 2767773. Please be advised that the Court will not enter the dismissal as submitted (CIV-110). The Court notes that this case was filed as a proposed class action. Dismissals of class actions (whether the class was certified or not) require an application to the Court and the Court's approval (CRC Rule 3.770 et seq). Judicial Council Form CIV-110 may not be used for dismissal of a derivative action or a class action or of any party or cause of action in a class action (CRC Rules 3.760 and 3.770). Moreover, the dismissal may only be with prejudice as to the named individual, and without prejudice as to the class. Please submit your request in the form of a Request and Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Class Claims and Dismissal With Prejudice of the Named Plaintiff. Thank you.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Walsh, Brian C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: (1st CMC) Proposed Class Action * Employment * 1st Amended Complaint filed 3/23/18 * Deemed complex on 3/29/18; discovery was NOT stayed; responsive pleading deadline was NOT stayed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Entry of Order - Lee - Ntc Entry Order.pdf: Comment: Notice: Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing: Petition Compel Arbitration - Stipulation and Order to Continue Defendant's Petition to Compel Arbitration: Memorandum Points and Authorities: Lee - Wilson Dec iso 2nd PCA.pdf: Lee - Deer Dec iso 2nd PCA.pdf: Lee - BLJ Dec iso 2nd PCA.pdf: Request Judicial Notice: Lee - Proposed Order re 2nd Amended PCA.pdf: Lee - Proof.pdf: Lee - Ntc 2nd Amended PCA.pdf: Motion Compel Arbitration: 2018.8.31 Opp MPA to Arbitration.pdf: 2018.8.31 Decl McHenry.pdf: 2018.8.31 Decl Lee.pdf: 2018.8.31 Proposed Order.pdf: 2018.8.31 POS Arbitration.pdf: Lee - Repl;y iso 2nd PCA.pdf: Lee - Objections to Evidence.pdf: Lee - Proposed Order re Objections.pdf: Lee- Proof.pdf: Minutes Non-Criminal: Judicial Officer: Walsh, Brian C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard: Granted; Comment: Petition by Defendant Google, Inc. to Compel Arbitration or Stay Action (AMENDED moving papers filed on 5/18/18) (SECOND AMENDED moving papers filed 8/10/18)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Order After 9-14-18 Petition by Defendant Google, Inc. to Compel Arbitration Stay Action: Comment: Order After 9/14/18 Hearing on Petition by Defendant Google, Inc. to Compel Arbitration or Stay Action - signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order - Minutes Non-Criminal:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Lee- Proof.pdf: Comment: HRG 9/14/18: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: Proposed - Lee - Proposed Order re Objections.pdf: Comment: HRG 9/14/18: Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition/Objections - Lee - Objections to Evidence.pdf: Comment: HRG 9/14/18: Objection to Plaintiff's Evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketDeclaration: In Support - Comment: of Emily Takashima Wilson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketPetition (Unlimited) (No Fee) - Comment: Petition to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Judicial Proceedings; 7/19/18; 9 AM; D13; Atty Johnsrud

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Petition to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Judicial Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketFirst Paper Filed - Fee - Comment: Taken on Petition to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: First Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: 36 (UL)- Complex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: First Amended; Atty McHenry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara