This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 04:57:31 (UTC).

Long v. Juniper Networks (US), Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 Long filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Juniper Networks US , Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6462

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMIE LONG

Defendant

JUNIPER NETWORKS (US), INC.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan Michael Lebe

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Order: Deeming Case Complex

4/6/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Civil Lawsuit Notice

4/6/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/6/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/6/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/9/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

4/6/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Civil Lawsuit Notice

4/6/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/6/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/6/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

5/9/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Statement: Case Management Conference

8/15/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

8/19/2022 Minute Order

Notice

8/22/2022 Notice

Notice

12/7/2022 Notice

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: CMC reset from 2/22/23 to 4/5/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: CMC set for 2/22/23 at 2:30pm in D3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 3; Time: 2:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Comment: Joint Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: JAMIE LONG,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee Paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JAMIE LONG,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: JAMIE LONG,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 8/17/22 at 2:30pm in D3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less