Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:42:25 (UTC).

Lobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation vs Margarita Romo

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Lobel Financial Corp , A California Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Margarita Romo. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2429

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation

Defendant

Romo, Margarita O

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Huang, Shiao-Wen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: **PENDING**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Default Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: Of Dianne M Cravens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: ***PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Memorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Declaration: CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Declaration: CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Does 1 - 10 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Default Entered - Comment: (e-served 07/16/19 #3132298)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: proof of service of summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Affidavit: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less