This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 18:45:36 (UTC).

Lisa Sipko and Robert Sipko

Case Summary

On 05/27/2015 Lisa Sipko and Robert Sipko was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Grilli, Mary Ann, Scott, Stuart J and Durkin, Dennis J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4686

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Grilli, Mary Ann

Scott, Stuart J

Durkin, Dennis J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa Sipko

Petitioner

Sipko, Lisa

Defendant

Robert Sipko

Respondent

Sipko, Robert

Minor

Sipko, Gabriela Marie

Other

Judge Pro Tem, Dennis J. Durkin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Philip S Silvestri

550 Price Avenue, Ste. A

Redwood City, CA 94063

Walter P. Hammon

75 E. Santa Clara St., Ste. 1400

San Jose, CA 95113

Petitioner Attorneys

Hammon, Walter P.

Silvestri, Philip S

Hammon, Cory

Respondent Attorney

Daprile, Natalie T

Other Attorney

Durkin, Dennis John

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Scott, Stuart J; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Sipko, Lisa; Sipko, Robert; Sipko, Gabriela Marie; Judge Pro Tem, Dennis J. Durkin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Proof of Service: Electronic - Comment: (P) RFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Request for Order (Modification) - Comment: (P) Mod c/s (Private Judge No Hearing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Order - Comment: c/c and case management order by Judge Pro Tem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Other - Comment: Amendment to I & E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Declaration: Income and Expense - Comment: Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: prod for prod of docs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Order - Comment: Case Management Order 2/25/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: reg QDRO reg servicerocket 401k

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Proof of Service: Mail; Letter to Michael Kerner Ph.D dated 7/2/18

    Read MoreRead Less
193 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2015
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Text = of ptr Legacy Name = FL Declaration Decision = M Closed = 10/28/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 07/09/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Response: Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Response DS/NL/LS Decision = M Closed = 07/09/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Text = petition, summons, etc Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 06/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • Other - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Text = association of attorneys, Walter Pierce Hammon Legacy Name = FL Other... Decision = M Closed = 06/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • Bulk Scanned Documents - Comment: Bulk Scan 05-27-15 to 12-02-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 05/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 05/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 05/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Grilli, Mary Ann; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 05/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DURKIN, DENNIS J.