This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/19/2018 at 23:30:55 (UTC).

Linda Sinyard and Michael Sinyard

Case Summary

On 08/29/2014 Linda Sinyard and Michael Sinyard was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph, Irwin and Pennypacker, Philip H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2358

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Joseph, Irwin

Pennypacker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda Sinyard

Petitioner

Sinyard, Linda

Defendant

Michael Sinyard

Respondent

Sinyard, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David A. Patton

1871 The Alameda, Suite 475

San Jose, CA 95126-1755

Petitioner Attorney

Patton, David A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Name: Sinyard, Michael; Party: Name: Sinyard, Linda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • Request for Order: Attorney Fees - Original Type: Request for Order: Attorney Fees; Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar (before hearing); Comment: Text = (p) spousal support; other....jp, c/f 10-29-14 per atty Lonich & Patton by agreement gj.; c/f 2-25-15 due to calendar conflict, notice sent, hlo; o/c per Request for Dismissal filed 2-19-15..sb Result By = C Result Judge = PHP - Pennypacker, Philip Result Date = 02/19/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • Request for Order: Attorney Fees - Original Type: Request for Order: Attorney Fees; Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued: Future Month; Comment: Text = (p) spousal support; other....jp, c/f 10-29-14 per atty Lonich & Patton by agreement gj. Result By = C Result Judge = IJ - Joseph, Irwin Result Date = 10/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = Req:Dismissal,Entire W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 02/19/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • Conference: Status - Original Type: Conference: Status; Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar (before hearing); Comment: Text = psstc-jp, off per atty Lonich & Patton by agreement gj. Result By = P Result Judge = IJ - Joseph, Irwin Result Date = 12/04/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • Request for Order: Attorney Fees - Original Type: Request for Order: Attorney Fees; Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued: Future Month; Comment: Text = (p) spousal support; other....jp Result By = P Result Judge = IJ - Joseph, Irwin Result Date = 09/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 09/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • Bulk Scanned Documents-Conversion Case - Comment: Bulk Scan 08-29-14 to 02-19-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = gretchen boger Legacy Name = FL Declaration Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = forensic expert... Legacy Name = FL Declaration Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Declaration Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • Declaration: Income and Expense - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • Request for Order: Attorney Fees - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = (p) spousal support; other... Legacy Name = FL Req for Ord:Attorney Fees Closed = 02/19/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • Petition: Dissolution no minor - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage/No minor Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • Declaration: Income and Expense - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less