This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 19:35:21 (UTC).

Linda Roatch vs Ray Cruz

Case Summary

On 04/13/2018 Linda Roatch filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Ray Cruz. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pegg, Lori E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0291

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pegg, Lori E

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Roatch, Linda Sue

Linda Sue Roatch

Respondents

Cruz, Ray A

Ray A Cruz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Re: Diligence; Filed By: Linda Roatch,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Non Service; Comment: received: DV- 110,..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketDescription: Waiver on Hearing on Denied Request for TRO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketDescription: Request: Domestic Violence Restraining Order; Filed By: Linda Roatch, Ray Cruz,; Comment: partly granted, partly denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less