This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 07/29/2022 at 09:26:40 (UTC).

LINDA GARZA et al vs KAISER PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 LINDA GARZA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against KAISER PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Barrett, Thang N. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0878

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Barrett, Thang N

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARZA, LINDA

GARZA, RICHARD

LINDA GARZA

RICHARD GARZA

Defendants

McLEAN, M.D., WILLIAM

PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

KAISER PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

KAISER SAN JOSE MEDICAL CENTER

WILLIAM McLEAN, M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Newkirk, William Henry

William Henry Newkirk

Defendant Attorneys

Simonson, John S.

John S. Simonson

 

Court Documents

Order

5/10/2021 Order

Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil)

5/10/2021 Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil)

Ex Parte Application - Notice Required

5/6/2021 Ex Parte Application - Notice Required

Declaration

5/6/2021 Declaration

Request: Judicial Notice

5/6/2021 Request: Judicial Notice

Declaration

5/6/2021 Declaration

Proof of Service

5/6/2021 Proof of Service

Notice

12/15/2020 Notice

Stipulation and Order

1/10/2020 Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order

11/5/2019 Stipulation and Order

Minute Order

10/16/2019 Minute Order

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

10/7/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

10/2/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Summons: Issued/Filed

7/3/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/3/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/3/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: KAISER PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, KAISER SAN JOSE MEDICAL CENTER, PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, WILLIAM McLEAN, M.D.,; Comment: Order Granting Dismissal of Entire Action of All Parties and all Causes of action with prejudice: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the entire action of all parties and all causes of action are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kirwan, Dept. 19. EFS 5/10/21rb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil); Filed By: KAISER PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, KAISER SAN JOSE MEDICAL CENTER, PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Ex Parte Application - Notice Required; Filed By: PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP,; Comment: For Order Granting Dismissal of Entire Action (John Simonson)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: KAISER PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, KAISER SAN JOSE MEDICAL CENTER, PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, WILLIAM McLEAN, M.D.,; Comment: Of Victor Ng in support of ex parte appl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Judicial Notice; Filed By: KAISER PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, KAISER SAN JOSE MEDICAL CENTER, PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, WILLIAM McLEAN, M.D.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: KAISER PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, KAISER SAN JOSE MEDICAL CENTER, PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, WILLIAM McLEAN, M.D.,; Comment: Of John Simonson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: KAISER PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, KAISER SAN JOSE MEDICAL CENTER, PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, WILLIAM McLEAN, M.D.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: Notice of Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment Award

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: KAISER PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, KAISER SAN JOSE MEDICAL CENTER, PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP,; Comment: To Stay Action Pening Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP,; Comment: ***REJECTED per Judge Arand*** to Stay Action Pending Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketDescription: First Paper Filed - Fee; Filed By: KAISER PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, KAISER SAN JOSE MEDICAL CENTER, PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, WILLIAM McLEAN, M.D.,; Comment: on Stip/Order to Stay action pending arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 3:45PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: LINDA GARZA, RICHARD GARZA,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: LINDA GARZA, RICHARD GARZA,; Comment: CASE # ON DOCUMENT DOES NOT MATCH CASE # ASSOCIATED WITH ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: LINDA GARZA,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: LINDA GARZA, RICHARD GARZA,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: LINDA GARZA, RICHARD GARZA,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: LINDA GARZA, RICHARD GARZA,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kaiser Permanente Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases where The Permanente Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEWKIRK WILLIAM