This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 00:40:35 (UTC).

Linda Balangue et al vs Lifehouse San Jose Healthcare Center et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2016 Linda Balangue filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Lifehouse San Jose Healthcare Center. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Folan, Maureen A, Kirwan, Peter, Strickland, Elizabeth, Zepeda, Carrie and Rudy, Christopher G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5428

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Folan, Maureen A

Kirwan, Peter

Strickland, Elizabeth

Zepeda, Carrie

Rudy, Christopher G

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

GAL Diane Carlson

Balangue, Linda

Carlson, Diane

Bolante, Marilyn

Defendants

Lifehouse Health Services LLC

Dragonfruit Holdings LLC

Lifehouse San Jose Operations LLC

Lifehouse San Jose Healthcare Center

San Jose Healthcare Center

Canyon Springs Post Acute

Lifehouse San Jose

Canyon Spring Post Acute

Lifehouse San Jose Operations, LLC

Tse, Daniel, MD

Ly, Hongdu K., DO

Vohra Wound Care Physicians of California, PC

Tse, Phillip, MD

Milpitas Care Center

Ly, D.O, Hongdu K

Guardian Ad Litems

Individually and as GAL for LINDA BALANGUE, Deceased

Carlson, Diane

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

Robbins, Clay, III

Defendant Attorneys

Allen, Tom M

Wilson, William C

Marsh, Barry C.

Jenkins, Spencer Howard

Beach, Thomas Edwin

Humphrey, Kathleen Ann

Lessner, Tessa R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Comment: EST. 15 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Conference: Settlement Jury - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Reserved: Summary Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: by Def. Vohra & Dr. Ly (Spencer Jenkins) Lindia 805-388-3100 TT 05/30/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Reserved: Summary Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: as to Finanical Elder Absue and Unfair Business Practices by Def. Milpitas Care Center (T. Lessner) 415 362-2580

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: as to Stautory Elder Abuse by Def. Milpitas Care Center (T. Lessner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Def's Motion for Summary Adj. as to Plt's First Cause of Action for Statutory Elder Abuse is DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Notice: Change Address/Firm Name - Comment: Notice of Change of Address and Handling Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Response/Reply - Comment: Reply in Support of Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support

    Read MoreRead Less
202 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less