This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:02:03 (UTC).

Lincoln Easy Cash, Inc. vs Cameron Nazeri

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Lincoln Easy Cash, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cameron Nazeri. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6074

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lincoln Easy Cash, Inc.

Unlimited Auto Title Loan

Defendants

Nazeri, Cameron Ahad

Nazermoussavi, Cameron Ahad

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ahmad, Khalil

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • Request: Action - Comment: Order - Striking def's 6/27/18 Answer for non payment of first paper fees signed by Judge Arand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Deny - Comment: Denied by Judge Arand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Answer (Limited): Up to $10K - Comment: Pro Per **STRICKEN per 2/14/19 order**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Affidavit: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less