This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:15:56 (UTC).

Lien Nguyen vs Jose Macedo

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Lien Nguyen filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jose Macedo. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirwan, Peter and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1839

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirwan, Peter

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nguyen, Lien Phuong

Defendant

Macedo, Jose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shin, Andrew Bo-Kyun

Defendant Attorney

Toal, John Andrew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Nguyen, Lien Phuong; Macedo, Jose; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: *continued from 05/01/18*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: atty Chan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Atty: John Toal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less